MD HB1485 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, from 5 to 10 feet, the distance from certain piers, wharves, or other structures in certain counties within which the owner has exclusive use of the area for growing oysters in a certain manner; altering the manner by which oysters may be grown and harvested in proximity to piers, wharves, or other structures; and providing that certain oysters may not be commercially harvested, sold, or marketed for human consumption.
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
Sponsors
Del. Mark Fisher [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531 |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {314236/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Calvert County
Fish and Fishing
Howard County
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Oysters
Piers and Docks
St. Mary's County
Talbot County
Calvert County
Fish and Fishing
Howard County
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Oysters
Piers and Docks
St. Mary's County
Talbot County