MD HB147 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the manner in which seized contraband tobacco products or specified conveyances used to transport tobacco products are processed following seizure; authorizing the Comptroller to destroy contraband tobacco products seized and forfeited under specified circumstances; and requiring the Comptroller to remove seized contraband tobacco products on or before a specified date.
Title
Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizure and Disposition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {493694/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | House | Reassigned to Economic Matters |
2013-01-17 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Cigarettes
Comptroller
Counties
Criminal Law - Procedure
Jurisdiction
Search and Seizure
Taxes - Sales and Use
Tobacco
Comptroller
Counties
Criminal Law - Procedure
Jurisdiction
Search and Seizure
Taxes - Sales and Use
Tobacco