MD HB1469 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $500,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Maryland Food Bank, Inc. for specified development or improvement purposes related to the Maryland Food Bank, located in Maryland; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Food Bank Creating Capacity While Serving Communities Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2014-02-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |