MD HB1468 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $300,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of Kennard Alumni Association, Inc. for the repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of Kennard High School, located in Centreville; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Kennard High School Restoration Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 9:00 a.m. |
2013-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |