MD HB1454 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing an additional 5% tax credit for certain expenditures under the Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit for certain commercial rehabilitations that qualify as affordable housing; requiring that the amount of an expired or unclaimed initial credit certificate remain in a certain Reserve Fund and increase the amount of initial credit certificates that the Maryland Historical Trust may issue for the following fiscal year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit – Commercial Rehabilitations – Affordable Housing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-29) (Y: 110 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-26HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842
2018-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-04-04SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2018-03-29SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed (109-29)
2018-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {395862/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback