MD HB1447 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person who is licensed to drive by another state to participate in the Ignition Interlock System Program under certain circumstances; prohibiting a nonresident participant in the Program from driving or attempting to drive certain vehicles; modifying certain procedures used by police officers and the Motor Vehicle Administration concerning certain administrative offenses; etc.
Title
Ignition Interlock System Program - Administrative Offenses - Out-of-State Licensed Drivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {552917/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Drivers' Licenses
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Residency
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Residency
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving