MD HB1446 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from causing to be recorded a governing document or charter document of an entity that the person knows is not authorized by a specified individual or that otherwise does not conform to State law; authorizing a person who believes that a governing document or charter document was recorded in violation of a specified provision of the Act to submit a specified affidavit to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; requiring the Department to send a specified notice in a specified manner; etc.
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Recordation of Governing and Charter Documents - Prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653 |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-2) |
2016-04-11 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {409337/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {383199/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Attorneys' Fees
Circuit Courts
Commerce and Business
Corporations and Associations
Damages
Fees
Forfeiture
Licenses
Names
Notices
Recordation
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Attorneys' Fees
Circuit Courts
Commerce and Business
Corporations and Associations
Damages
Fees
Forfeiture
Licenses
Names
Notices
Recordation
Registration
Rules and Regulations