MD HB1446 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $250,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Trustees of Leadenhall Baptist Church, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Leadenhall Community Outreach Center, located in Baltimore City; prohibiting the use of the loan proceeds or matching fund for sectarian religious purposes; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Leadenhall Community Outreach Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |