MD HB1442 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 471
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 471
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "expanded polystyrene food service product" to exclude certain egg cartons shipped into the State for packaging or cartons of eggs that have been packaged within the State for sale within the State.
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 471 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {840414/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB840 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 472
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |