MD HB1440 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the office of subtreasurer of a campaign finance entity; authorizing the chair of a campaign finance entity to make a disbursement for the campaign finance entity under specified circumstances; requiring a chair who makes a disbursement for a campaign finance entity to submit a specified report to the treasurer within a specified period of time; prohibiting a chair who is a candidate from making a disbursement; etc.
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entity - Officers Authorized to Perform Duties
Sponsors
Del. Kumar Barve [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-02 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-04-02 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-03-21 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-21 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-10 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-08 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |