MD HB144 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Including income from specified retirement plans within a subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for retired individuals who are at least 65 years old or who are disabled or whose spouse is disabled; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014; etc.
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income (Fairness in Taxation for Retirees Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |