MD HB144 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the People's Insurance Counsel Division in the Office of the Attorney General and provisions of law relating to the Division; and requiring that all equipment and other assets of the Division be transferred to the Maryland Insurance Administration on July 1, 2010.
Title
People's Insurance Counsel Division in the Office of the Attorney General -
Sponsors
Del. Susan Aumann [R] | Del. Joseph Bartlett [R] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Del. Wendell Beitzel [R] |
Del. Joseph Boteler [R] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Del. Donald Dwyer [R] | Del. Warren Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/2 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-20 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assessments
Attorney General
Consumer Protection
Insurance
Medical Malpractice
Ombudsmen
Prices
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Assessments
Attorney General
Consumer Protection
Insurance
Medical Malpractice
Ombudsmen
Prices
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0144.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0144f.pdf |