MD HB1436 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to designate certain Purple Line transit stations by certain names; and defining the "Purple Line" as a light rail transit line that provides transit service between Bethesda in Montgomery County and New Carrollton in Prince George's County
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Purple Line Transit Stations - Naming
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Names
Prince George's County
Transportation - Generally
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Names
Prince George's County
Transportation - Generally