MD HB1435 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-27 - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-27 - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore to establish by ordinance a Community Benefits District in the East Baltimore section to be a special tax district and provide specified services; authorizing the Mayor and City Council to establish a Community Benefits District Authority to provide specified services; requiring a specified ordinance to include specified provisions; requiring the Authority to establish a specified financial plan for the District under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Baltimore City Charter - Community Benefits District - East Baltimore
Sponsors
Del. Talmadge Branch [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Hattie Harrison [D] | Del. Keith Haynes [D] |
Del. Ruth Kirk [D] | Del. Melvin Stukes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-03-09 | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) | |
2010-03-08 | Re-referred Economic Matters & Ways and Means | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Exemptions
Fees
Hearings
Laws and Ordinances
Liability
Minorities
Notices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Special Tax Districts
Tax Credits
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Exemptions
Fees
Hearings
Laws and Ordinances
Liability
Minorities
Notices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Special Tax Districts
Tax Credits