MD HB1434 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the Community Services Reimbursement Rate Commission; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish and hire an independent contractor to verify a specified cost structure related to inflationary cost adjustments for community services providers; requiring the Department to conduct a specified study and assess specified cost structures in a specified manner; requiring a specified independent contractor to collect and analyze specified data and conduct a specified assessment; etc.
Title
Community Services - Provider Reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2014-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Developmental Disabilities
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Community Facilities and Services
Developmental Disabilities
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports