MD HB1430 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB546
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "proceeds" to allow a video lottery operator, under certain circumstances, to reduce the amount of proceeds received from video lottery terminals and table games by the amount of certain uncollectible negotiable instruments for up to 7 days following a certain determination; requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to adopt certain regulations; requiring the video lottery operator to provide a quarterly report to certain committees regarding certain uncollectible or forgiven debts; etc.
Title
Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 113 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-21) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {625161/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-24 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1430 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Casinos
Checks
Credit
Debt Collection
Equipment
Gaming
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Rules and Regulations
Time
Checks
Credit
Debt Collection
Equipment
Gaming
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Rules and Regulations
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 1A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 1A-26 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |