MD HB1427 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a certain child or surviving spouse of a certain veteran of the United States armed forces from paying tuition at a public institution of higher education; providing the eligibility criteria for receiving the exemption; requiring the institutions to report to the Maryland Higher Education Commission each year; requiring the Commission to report to the General Assembly each year; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption - Spouses and Dependents of Disabled Veterans
Sponsors
Del. Alice Cain [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Apprentices
Armed Forces
Certifications
Death
Disabilities
Fees
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Housing
Licenses
Poverty
Registration
Reports
Residency
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Spouses
Time
Tuition
Veterans
Armed Forces
Certifications
Death
Disabilities
Fees
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Housing
Licenses
Poverty
Registration
Reports
Residency
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Spouses
Time
Tuition
Veterans