MD HB1425 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a special event permit in Washington County; authorizing a holder of a Class 3 winery license or a Class 4 limited winery license in the county to sell beer, wine that is produced by the holder, and liquor for on-premises consumption at specified events; requiring the permit holder, before using the permit, to notify the Board of License Commissioners at least 1 week before an event is to occur; authorizing the license holder to use the permit no more than 60 times in a year; and providing an annual permit fee of $1,000.
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McKay [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {193990/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Washington County