MD HB1424 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition to make recommendations regarding how the State may adjust its economic development and other strategies in the context of changes resulting from crises in certain sectors; and requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim report on or before December 1, 2022, and a final report on or before December 1, 2023, to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2022-02-17 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB782 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Subjects
Appropriations
Child Care
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
COVID-19
Economic Development
Emergencies
Health
Higher Education
Legislative Services, Department of
pandemics
Real Estate
Remote and Hybrid Education
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unemployment
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment
Child Care
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
COVID-19
Economic Development
Emergencies
Health
Higher Education
Legislative Services, Department of
pandemics
Real Estate
Remote and Hybrid Education
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unemployment
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment