MD SB782 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB896
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition to make recommendations regarding how the State may adjust its economic development and other strategies in the context of changes resulting from crises in certain sectors; and requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim report on or before December 1, 2022, and a final report of its findings and recommendations on or before December 1, 2023, to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {583621/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB896 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
HB1424 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
HB1424 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Subjects
Appropriations
Child Care
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
COVID-19
Cybersecurity
Economic Development
Emergencies
Health
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Legislative Services, Department of
pandemics
Real Estate
Remote and Hybrid Education
Reports
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unemployment
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment
Child Care
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
COVID-19
Cybersecurity
Economic Development
Emergencies
Health
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Legislative Services, Department of
pandemics
Real Estate
Remote and Hybrid Education
Reports
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unemployment
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment