MD HB1419 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 to allow grants for the Linwood Center to be used for construction and capital equipping; extending to June 1, 2014, the deadline for the Board of Directors of the Linwood Center, Inc. to present evidence of a specified matching fund; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Linwood Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-15 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |