MD HB1409 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the authority of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to sell real property solely to enforce a lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer services; prohibiting Baltimore City from acquiring real property by means of execution of a judgment under certain circumstances; providing that the Act applies prospectively to liens attached to real property on or after July 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {905662/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties - Local Laws
Judgments
Liens
Real Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Water
Counties - Local Laws
Judgments
Liens
Real Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Water