MD HB1402 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $200,000 to $300,000 the maximum amount of specified tax proceeds required to be deposited by the Comptroller into the Mel Noland Woodland Incentives Fund; and altering the parcels of land for which specified counties are required to remit agricultural transfer tax proceeds to the Comptroller to include parcels of land that are at least 90% woodland.
Title
Agricultural Transfer Tax - Distribution to Mel Noland Woodland Incentives Fund
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn |
2014-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | House | Rereferred to Environmental Matters |
2014-02-12 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Agriculture
Comptroller
Forests and Parks
Natural Resources - Generally
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Property
Transfer Tax
Comptroller
Forests and Parks
Natural Resources - Generally
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Property
Transfer Tax