MD HB1402 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 968
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 968
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the right of certain employees of the Office of the State's Attorney in Montgomery County to organize and collectively bargain in accordance with certain personnel law governing county employees; establishing that employees of the Office of the State's Attorney are subject to the county merit system law and personnel regulations; establishing certain requirements related to collective bargaining for employees of the Office; etc.
Title
Montgomery County – State’s Attorney’s Office Personnel – Application of County Personnel Laws and Collective Bargaining MC 12–24
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 968 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-6) |
2024-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {863427/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-02-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Arbitration
Budgets
Charters
Collective Bargaining
Contractors
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
County Executives
Criminal Law - Procedures
Discipline
Emergencies
Equipment
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Public Employees
Recruitment and Hiring
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Standards and Best Practices
State's Attorneys
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budgets
Charters
Collective Bargaining
Contractors
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
County Executives
Criminal Law - Procedures
Discipline
Emergencies
Equipment
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Public Employees
Recruitment and Hiring
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Standards and Best Practices
State's Attorneys
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 15 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |