MD HB1401 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 466
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Adding an exemption from the Prince George's County school facilities surcharge for single-family dwelling units to be built by the Foundation for Applied Construction Technology for Students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge - Foundation for Applied Construction Technology for Students PG 413-20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 466
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-15SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Prince George's County10192.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback