MD HB1397 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Ethics Commission to adopt specified model ethics provisions for school boards; providing that a model provision may be adopted by or imposed on a school board under specified circumstances; repealing a requirement that a regulated lobbyist attend a training course within a specified time period; altering the information related to employment and sources of earned income that a member of the General Assembly is required to report to the Joint Ethics Committee; etc.
Title
Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {954331/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {680416/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Environmental Matters |
2013-02-14 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Ethics
General Assembly
Job Training
Legislative Services, Department of
Lobbying
Municipal Corporations
Petitions
Privacy
Public Officials
Reports
Salaries
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Ethics
General Assembly
Job Training
Legislative Services, Department of
Lobbying
Municipal Corporations
Petitions
Privacy
Public Officials
Reports
Salaries
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment