MD HB1389 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a $7.50 District Court surcharge shall apply to specified traffic cases; requiring that the surcharge be imposed as a court cost; altering the funds to which the Comptroller is required to credit specified surcharges collected under specified circumstances; making stylistic and conforming changes; etc.
Title
Traffic Cases - State Police Helicopters and Ambulance, Fire, and Rescue
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Susan Aumann [R] | Del. John Bohanan [D] | Del. Talmadge Branch [D] |
Del. William Bronrott [D] | Del. Norman Conway [D] | Del. Joseph Vallario [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-10 | Third Reading Passed (43-1) | |
2010-04-09 | Special Order later today (Senator Frosh) Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-09 | Committee Amendment Withdrawn | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-07 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-07 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-31 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2010-04-09 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (130-7) | |
2010-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-03-05 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) | |
2010-03-08 | Re-referred Judiciary & Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-05 | Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters) | |
2010-02-19 | Hearing 3/9 at 2:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters) | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading Environmental Matters & Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Aircraft
Court Costs
District Courts
Emergency Medical Services
Fines
Fire Protection
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes
State Police, Department of
Traffic Regulation
Volunteers
Court Costs
District Courts
Emergency Medical Services
Fines
Fire Protection
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes
State Police, Department of
Traffic Regulation
Volunteers