MD HB1384 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Industry 4.0 Technology Grant Program in the Department of Commerce to provide grants to small and medium-sized manufacturing enterprises to assist those manufacturers with implementing new Industry 4.0 technology or related infrastructure for certain purposes; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $1,000,000 to the Program for fiscal year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter; and creating the Maryland Manufacturing 4.0 Initiative Governance Committee.
Title
Economic Development - Industry 4.0 Technology Grant Program (Maryland Manufacturing Innovation Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Del. Lily Qi [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-1) |
2022-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {813628/1 Adopted |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Data
Economic Development
Grants
Industry and Technology
internet
Investments
Minorities
Radio
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budgets
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Data
Economic Development
Grants
Industry and Technology
internet
Investments
Minorities
Radio
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 5 | 1901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |