MD HB1362 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law requiring that the proceeds of the Harford County transfer tax be distributed to the county's agricultural land preservation program and to fund school site acquisition and school construction or certain indebtedness for school site acquisition and school construction; and authorizing the Harford County Council to determine, by law, the manner in which the proceeds of the Harford County transfer tax are distributed.
Title
Harford County - Transfer Tax - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2020-03-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Agriculture
Construction
County Councils
Farmland
Harford County
Land Preservation Trusts
Laws and Ordinances
Public Schools
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Construction
County Councils
Farmland
Harford County
Land Preservation Trusts
Laws and Ordinances
Public Schools
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Harford County | 123 | 51 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Harford County | 123 | 52 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1362?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1362f.pdf |