MD HB1358 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $200,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of Girl Scouts of Central Maryland, Inc. for the planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Camp Woodlands Teepee, located in Annapolis; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Teepee Project
Sponsors
Del. Mary Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m. |
2013-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-11 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Annapolis
Anne Arundel County
Camps
Forests and Parks
Grants
Nonprofit Organizations
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Anne Arundel County
Camps
Forests and Parks
Grants
Nonprofit Organizations
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)