MD HB1351 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing county boards of education to authorize a student to satisfy a State or county middle or high school foreign language requirement by completing a course in computer programming language; etc.
Title
Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language Courses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to interim study by Ways and Means |
2017-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-13 | House | Reassigned to Ways and Means |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Language
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Language
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology