MD HB135 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the fee that specified business entities must pay for filing a required annual report with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; exempting a person who did not own specified property during the preceding calendar year from submitting a report on personal property to the Department; requiring the person to submit an affidavit attesting that the person has no tax liability for the taxable period to the Department on or before April 15; specifying the form and contents of the affidavit; etc.
Title
Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agriculture
Banks and Trust Companies
Business Trusts
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Credit Unions
Exemptions
Fees
Financial Institutions
Foreign Ownership
Limited Liability Companies
Personal Property
Property Tax
Real Estate Investment Trusts
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Savings and Loan Associations
Taxes - Property
Banks and Trust Companies
Business Trusts
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Credit Unions
Exemptions
Fees
Financial Institutions
Foreign Ownership
Limited Liability Companies
Personal Property
Property Tax
Real Estate Investment Trusts
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Savings and Loan Associations
Taxes - Property