MD HB1347 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each county board of education to keep a record of the race and gender of all applicants for a position with the local school system and of any individuals who are hired for a position with the local school system, compile the information in a searchable and analyzable electronic format, and publish the information for the immediately preceding year on its website on or before February 1 each year, beginning in 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Applicants for Employment - Race and Gender Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2020-02-26HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education6124(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback