MD HB1345 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the National Capital Strategic Economic Development Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund to provide grants to government agencies and nonprofit community development organizations for commercial or residential development projects for site acquisition, land assembly, architecture and engineering, and site development for revitalization in an area designated as a sustainable community; requiring an appropriation to the Fund to be allocated in a specified manner; etc.
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-47) (Y: 91 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-47) (Y: 91 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-47) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {240413/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Community Development
Comptroller
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Treasurers
Urban Renewal
Comptroller
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Treasurers
Urban Renewal