MD HB1344 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Hearing: Mar 26 @ 12:00 pm Senate Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of Juvenile Services to establish the Juvenile Strategic Reentry Program for children committed to the custody or under the guardianship of the Department of Juvenile Services; establishing the purpose of the Program; requiring the Department to direct reentry specialists to oversee the return of certain children to the community; requiring that a reentry specialist meet with a child at least 45 days before the release of the child from an out-of-home placement; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Strategic Reentry Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {744460/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-05HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-18HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback