MD HB1334 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 761
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 761
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Highway Administration to establish a policy regarding the application of decorative treatments on traffic control devices that have been marred by graffiti or vandalism; authorizing a person to apply to a district office within the Administration for a permit to install decorative treatments, including a digitally printed vinyl wrap or paint, on a traffic control device; authorizing a district office to issue a specified permit; requiring the Administration to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Title
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Decorative Treatments
Sponsors
Sen. Alonzo Washington [D] | Del. Jay Jalisi [D] | Sen. Cory McCray [D] | Del. Carlos Sanchez [D] |
Del. James Tarlau [D] | Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D] | Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Del. Anne Healey [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-1) (Y: 126 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-1) (Y: 126 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 761 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-1) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {790414/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Highway Administration, State
Licenses
Rules and Regulations
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Highways
Vandalism
Licenses
Rules and Regulations
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Highways
Vandalism