MD HB1333 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB422
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to conduct a study of the participation of minority-owned businesses in the alcoholic beverages industry in the State; providing for the inclusion of certain issues in the study; requiring the Office to conduct the study in consultation and cooperation with certain agencies and interests; requiring the Office to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2021; etc.
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-1) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {233190/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB1333 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Counties
Discrimination
Human Relations
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minorities
Reports
Retail Sales
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Counties
Discrimination
Human Relations
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minorities
Reports
Retail Sales
Sunset
Transportation, Department of