MD HB1330 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the proceeds of table games paid to Baltimore City to be used for recreational facilities may only be used to supplement and not supplant existing expenses or obligations related to recreational facilities; and making the Act subject to a specified contingency.
Title
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Recreational Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |