MD HB1330 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering provisions of law relating to individuals required to obtain a criminal history records check; requiring an adult known to be residing in an informal child care provider's home to obtain a criminal history records check; requiring specified informal child care providers to obtain a criminal history records check; etc.
Title
Criminal History Records Checks - Informal Child Care Providers
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-02-28 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Child Care
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Education, State Department of
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Education, State Department of
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1330.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1330f.pdf |