MD HB1323 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law that prohibits a mortgage broker from charging a finder's fee in any transaction in which the mortgage broker or an owner, part owner, partner, director, officer, or employee of the mortgage broker is the lender.
Title
Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-22 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2011-03-04 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1323.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1323f.pdf |