MD HB1318 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified carriers to maintain or adhere to specified standards that assure that enrollees have access to specified health care providers and covered services; specifying the provisions of State insurance law relating to provider panels that apply to managed care organizations; authorizing the Commissioner to designate an insurer or nonprofit health service plan to offer a preferred provider insurance policy that conditions the payment of benefits on the use of preferred providers under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309 |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {867371/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {236986/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Dentists
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Diseases
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Ethnic Affairs
Federal Government
Fees
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Hospitals
Identification
Inspections
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Interstate Affairs
Language
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Prices
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Dentists
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Diseases
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Ethnic Affairs
Federal Government
Fees
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Hospitals
Identification
Inspections
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Interstate Affairs
Language
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Prices
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology