MD HB1310 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "health care provider" for purposes of health care malpractice claims.
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-10) (Y: 128 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-10) |
2013-03-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-25 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Barkley) {103229/1 Rejected |
2013-03-25 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Barkley) Adopted |
2013-03-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {212010/2 Report Adopted |
2013-03-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Assisted Living
Chiropractors
Civil Actions and Procedures
Clinics
Dentists
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospices
Hospitals
Licenses
Medical Malpractice
Nurses
Occupational Therapists
Optometrists
Osteopathy
Physical Therapists
Physicians
Podiatrists
Psychologists
Social Workers
Volunteers
Chiropractors
Civil Actions and Procedures
Clinics
Dentists
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospices
Hospitals
Licenses
Medical Malpractice
Nurses
Occupational Therapists
Optometrists
Osteopathy
Physical Therapists
Physicians
Podiatrists
Psychologists
Social Workers
Volunteers