MD HB1310 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that tax supported debt does not include specified capital leases used to finance energy performance contracts; excluding specified capital leases from the requirement that the Treasurer capitalize specified capital lease payments; restating the authority of the Treasurer to finance specified energy performance contracts as capital leases; and requiring that specified capital lease payments or specified contractor payments may not exceed specified energy savings.
Title
Tax Supported Debt - Energy Performance Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (108-30) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-07 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2011-03-02 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |