MD HB1307 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain youth development organizations and programs from the definition of a child care center; authorizing youth development organizations or programs to provide care for a child who is at least 5 years old who attends a public school; requiring a youth development organization to provide a safe child care environment and have certain policies and requirements; requiring certain youth development organizations and programs to submit annually to the State Department of Education certain information; etc.
Title
Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {995961/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-17 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Age
Age of Majority
Camps
Child Care
Children
Community Facilities and Services
Criminal Background Investigations
Disabilities
Disclosure
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Fees
Fire Protection
Health, Department of
Inspections
Insurance
Liability
Mental and Behavioral Health
Poverty
Public Information
Public Schools
Records
Remote and Hybrid Education
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Special Education
Sunset
Weights and Measures
Youth
Age of Majority
Camps
Child Care
Children
Community Facilities and Services
Criminal Background Investigations
Disabilities
Disclosure
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Fees
Fire Protection
Health, Department of
Inspections
Insurance
Liability
Mental and Behavioral Health
Poverty
Public Information
Public Schools
Records
Remote and Hybrid Education
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Special Education
Sunset
Weights and Measures
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 5 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 401.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |