MD HB1305 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a specified member of an unincorporated nonprofit association from being sued for specified debts, obligations, or other liabilities of the unincorporated nonprofit association; prohibiting an officer or a director of an unincorporated nonprofit association from being sued for specified debts, obligations, or other liabilities of the unincorporated nonprofit association under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Unincorporated Nonprofit Associations - Members and Officers - Personal Liability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |