MD HB1304 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 453
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 453
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an individual who hunts under a Deer Management Permit in Baltimore County to use certain firearms to hunt deer throughout the year, including all deer hunting seasons, in the locations and under the conditions set forth in the permit; and authorizing an individual who hunts under a Deer Management Permit in Baltimore County to hunt deer on certain lands under certain conditions.
Title
Baltimore County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Brooks [D] | Del. Kathy Szeliga [R] | Del. Talmadge Branch [D] | Del. Carl Jackson [D] |
Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 453 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-7) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-24 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |