MD HB1301 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a limited license to provide hair services under the State Board of Cosmetologists; specifying the level of supervision required for an apprentice hairstylist; requiring the Board to adopt regulations to set specified curriculum standards for specified students; establishing qualifications for applicants for a limited license to provide hair services; authorizing a beauty salon to operate as a limited practice beauty salon by providing only hair services; etc.
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Limited License - Hairstylist
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-10) (Y: 123 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-10) (Y: 123 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-10) |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {603994/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Apprentices
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Education
Licenses
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Education
Licenses
Registration
Rules and Regulations