MD HB1294 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing law providing for the Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund, the Stem Cell Research Commission, and State-funded stem cell research; repealing laws relating to senatorial and delegate scholarships; altering or repealing grant programs; altering the distribution of specified revenues; altering the distribution of highway user revenues for fiscal year 2012; stating the intent of the General Assembly regarding constraining spending in the State budget by implementation of specified actions; etc.
Title
Deficit Reduction Financing Act of 2011
Sponsors
Del. The Leader [?] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2011-03-03 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2011-02-25 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Abortion
Administrative Agencies
Admissions and Amusement Tax
Advertising
Animals
Appropriations
Attorney General
Bingo
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commercial Rehabilitation
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Contractors
Conventions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Education
Fuel Tax
Gaming
General Assembly
Grants
Health
Health Insurance
Hearings
Higher Education
Highways
Historical Matters
Hospitals
Judges
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Leases and Rent
Local Government Mandates
Mass Transit
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Motor Vehicles
Parole and Probation
Prince George's County
Procurement
Public Employees
Public Schools
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
Sales and Use Tax
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Aid
State Employees
State Hospitals
State Universities and Colleges
Tax Credits
Teachers
Television
Transportation, Department of
Tuition
Administrative Agencies
Admissions and Amusement Tax
Advertising
Animals
Appropriations
Attorney General
Bingo
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commercial Rehabilitation
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Contractors
Conventions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Education
Fuel Tax
Gaming
General Assembly
Grants
Health
Health Insurance
Hearings
Higher Education
Highways
Historical Matters
Hospitals
Judges
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Leases and Rent
Local Government Mandates
Mass Transit
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Motor Vehicles
Parole and Probation
Prince George's County
Procurement
Public Employees
Public Schools
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
Sales and Use Tax
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Aid
State Employees
State Hospitals
State Universities and Colleges
Tax Credits
Teachers
Television
Transportation, Department of
Tuition
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1294.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1294f.pdf |