MD HB1288 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission is required to disqualify an applicant who committed a crime involving moral turpitude from holding a video lottery employee license.
Title
Video Lottery Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663 |
2023-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {863223/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-06 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2023-02-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Work, Labor, and Employment
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 1A-14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |