MD HB1287 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the school leadership training program developed by the State Department of Education and the Accountability and Implementation Board to require that the State Superintendent, county superintendents, and the chair and vice chair of the State Board, a county board, and the Accountability and Implementation Board complete the training; combining two leadership trainings into a single training; and providing for the content of the school leadership training.
Title
School Leadership Training Program - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127 |
2024-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-3) |
2024-04-06 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {883226/1 Adopted |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-4) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {853225/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-02-23 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Counties
Demographics
Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Higher Education
internet
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Recruitment and Hiring
Remote and Hybrid Education
School Administration
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Counties
Demographics
Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Higher Education
internet
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Recruitment and Hiring
Remote and Hybrid Education
School Administration
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment